Financial history MERE HALL BOLTON LIMITED

Charity number: 1065100
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £165.90k £318.45k £121.96k £411.85k £203.65k
Total expenditure £152.84k £361.98k £176.58k £416.80k £187.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A