Financial history CRAWLEY GREEN PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1063066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £173.14k £158.05k £181.22k £176.38k £224.13k
Total expenditure £180.88k £171.77k £171.11k £186.28k £184.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £11.00k N/A N/A