Trustees CRAWLEY GREEN PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE
Charity number: 1063066

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Sygrove | Chair | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Fowler | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emilia Ciukaj | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Anne Guckian | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saara Storey | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Farzana Sharmin Mustafi | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalia Melgarejo Torralba | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Sygrove | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kirstie Cain | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.