Accounts and annual returns WOODLANDS PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1063969
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2014 31 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 December 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2013 29 July 2014 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 29 July 2014 29 days late
Annual return 31 August 2012 06 July 2014 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 06 July 2014 371 days late