Financial history WOODLANDS PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1063969
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014
Total gross income £32.82k £20.79k £26.69k £30.55k £22.55k
Total expenditure £19.65k £52.88k £31.72k £31.69k £31.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A