Financial history PRESTWICH, RADCLIFFE & WHITEFIELD SCOUT DISTRICT

Charity number: 1064794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.88k £26.96k £36.89k £5.58k £5.68k
Total expenditure £6.65k £18.27k £1.88k £23.53k £5.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £23.71k £2.77k N/A N/A