Trustees PRESTWICH, RADCLIFFE & WHITEFIELD SCOUT DISTRICT
Charity number: 1064794

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JOHN NORTH | Chair | 14 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Luke Guerin | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Riu | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Haughton | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN CARLINE | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stacey White | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rob Staton | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH BROMELOW | Trustee | 03 June 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.