Accounts and annual returns THE RESCUERS WILDLIFE SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1066161
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 02 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 15 April 2011 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required