Financial history THE RESCUERS WILDLIFE SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1066161
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £26.48k £38.16k £29.93k £24.09k £21.38k
Total expenditure £25.67k £26.09k £31.55k £29.93k £22.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A