Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN'S WELCOME CENTRE

Charity number: 1068100
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 19 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 01 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 20 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 31 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 31 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 24 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 24 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 30 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 30 September 2005 On Time