Accounts and annual returns FESTIVAL MEDICAL SERVICES

Charity number: 1068218
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2008 02 September 2009 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2007 15 March 2009 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 12 September 2008 12 days late
Annual return 31 October 2006 14 January 2008 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 22 January 2008 144 days late
Annual return 31 October 2005 22 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 22 August 2006 On Time