Financial history FESTIVAL MEDICAL SERVICES

Charity number: 1068218
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2004 31/10/2005 31/10/2006 31/10/2007 31/10/2008
Total gross income £87.14k £130.14k £55.02k £173.80k £0
Total expenditure £87.77k £87.01k £52.01k £112.94k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A