Financial history FRIENDS OF SILVERSTONE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1072339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.01k £42.60k £59.56k £20.66k £50.84k
Total expenditure £30.06k £28.32k £62.10k £33.35k £51.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A