Accounts and annual returns HAZLEMERE CHURCH OF ENGLAND COMBINED SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1067631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 22 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 23 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required