Financial history HAZLEMERE CHURCH OF ENGLAND COMBINED SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1067631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £16.21k £15.27k £19.86k £26.49k £15.24k
Total expenditure £12.22k £16.27k £16.37k £40.58k £4.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A