Accounts and annual returns LINCOLN CHRISTIANS IN MISSION

Charity number: 1068114
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 October 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 02 October 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 02 October 2014 03 March 2016 214 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 October 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 21 May 2015 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 15 December 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 17 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 28 November 2013 On Time