Financial history LINCOLN CHRISTIANS IN MISSION

Charity number: 1068114
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 02/10/2014
Total gross income £10.42k £31.87k £20.40k £17.20k £1.80k
Total expenditure £7.95k £35.35k £5.14k £32.32k £1.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A