Financial history THE HAYES PRIMARY SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1068442
Charity reporting is overdue by 1573 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £6.69k £6.62k £8.37k £7.91k £10.23k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0