Accounts and annual returns MATERNAL AND CHILDHEALTH ADVOCACY INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1071486
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2011 11 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 11 June 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2010 26 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 26 July 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2009 12 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 12 May 2010 On Time