Accounts and annual returns CHILDREN'S KIDNEY TRUST

Charity number: 1069071
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 06 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 26 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 03 March 2015 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 30 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required