Financial history CHILDREN'S KIDNEY TRUST

Charity number: 1069071
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/08/2015
Total gross income £39.48k £15.48k £575 £17.24k £5.17k
Total expenditure £36.14k £4.58k £10.15k £1.39k £21.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A