Accounts and annual returns OUNDLE RURAL MIND

Charity number: 1071432
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 18 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 22 November 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 07 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 09 January 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 06 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 26 July 2011 On Time