Financial history DAVID GOODMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1073195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £218.00k £0 £1.84k £5.00k £500
Total expenditure £113.84k £27.13k £76.24k £13.60k £5.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A