Accounts and annual returns WEST BERKSHIRE DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1077308
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 26 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 14 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required