Financial history WEST BERKSHIRE DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1077308
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £456 £254 £403 £370 £110
Total expenditure £705 £29 £492 £449 £863
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A