Financial history THE CARLISLE & DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity Number: 1073444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.68k £13.41k £16.44k £10.50k £10.01k
Total expenditure £27.23k £13.84k £14.69k £10.70k £9.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A