Trustees THE CARLISLE & DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity Number: 1073444

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Denyer | Chair | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean Wharram | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
June Copleston | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Trappe | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JANET DUTTON | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Farrer | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Jones | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Stockdale | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.