Accounts and annual returns THE JOHN MERRICKS SAILING TRUST

Charity number: 1076036
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 May 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 June 2019 On Time