Financial history THE JOHN MERRICKS SAILING TRUST

Charity number: 1076036
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £67.65k £29.32k £26.63k £685 £7.20k
Total expenditure £76.29k £51.71k £76.14k £55.57k £229.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A