Accounts and annual returns CHRIST CHURCH GARDENS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1074018
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 26 November 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 10 June 2009 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 13 November 2008 On Time