Financial history CHRIST CHURCH GARDENS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1074018
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £76.25k £23.12k £32.90k £39.78k £37.26k
Total expenditure £37.24k £32.36k £33.57k £45.09k £43.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A