Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF VAL BOLLER'S CAT RESCUE

Charity number: 1076182
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 14 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 14 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 05 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 09 September 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2012 28 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 28 June 2013 On Time