Financial history FRIENDS OF VAL BOLLER'S CAT RESCUE

Charity number: 1076182
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £31.00k £30.04k £30.96k £27.03k £450
Total expenditure £26.62k £30.68k £38.44k £27.39k £15.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A