Accounts and annual returns FLIMWELL VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1074628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 23 April 2024 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 05 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required