Financial history FLIMWELL VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1074628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £3.57k £14.50k £15.20k £10.02k £21.65k
Total expenditure £2.57k £12.22k £12.36k £26.05k £21.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £14.50k £1.50k £1.75k £4.50k