Accounts and annual returns SON RISE CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1076883
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 March 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 April 2018 On Time