Accounts and annual returns PHOENIX DRIVING GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074260
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 29 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 29 May 2008 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 December 2007 334 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required