Accounts and annual returns PARENTS, TEACHERS & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF TIBSHELF INFANT & NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1076979
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2008 26 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 26 March 2009 239 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required