Financial history NORTHERN LEARNING TRUST

Charity Number: 1075463
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £1.00m £1.01m £1.11m £870.62k £260.32k
Total expenditure £816.65k £855.44k £982.69k £964.27k £314.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £63.32k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £789.55k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £17.75k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £714.07k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £91.65k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A