Governing document NORTHERN LEARNING TRUST
Charity number: 1075463
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 FEBRUARY 1999 AS AMENDED 15TH OCTOBER 2002, 13 OCTOBER 2003, 22ND MARCH 2004 AND 11 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE LEARNING, INCLUDING LITERACY, NUMERACY AND COMMUNICATION SKILLS ACROSS THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.