Accounts and annual returns THE BRITISH FEDERATION OF YOUTH MARCHING BAND ORGANISATIONS

Charity number: 1079391
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2012 30 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 30 October 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2011 25 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2010 07 February 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 06 February 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2009 14 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 14 February 2010 On Time