Financial history THE BRITISH FEDERATION OF YOUTH MARCHING BAND ORGANISATIONS

Charity number: 1079391
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012
Total gross income £11.61k £29.24k £12.13k £2.51k £32.17k
Total expenditure £11.09k £23.75k £16.60k £7.96k £24.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A