Accounts and annual returns WALTER STRICKLAND DUCKLINGTON EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1075580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 27 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 May 2024 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 June 2023 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 June 2023 492 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required