Financial history WALTER STRICKLAND DUCKLINGTON EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1075580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.29k £1.42k £1.53k £1.73k £2.24k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A