Accounts and annual returns AID TO THE BALKANS FORWARD TRUST (A2B)

Charity Number: 1077088
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 03 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 08 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 08 October 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 25 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 25 October 2014 On Time