Trustees DIGARTREF CYF
Charity number: 1076680

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Hughes | Chair | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Pulford | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Buckingham | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleri Lloyd Burns | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Griffiths | Trustee | 19 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Glynne Fraser | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Roberts | Trustee | 12 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Alan Griffiths | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julia Morgan | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Blackburn | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAFYDD JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.