Accounts and annual returns ETHELBURGA FAMILY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1077009
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 March 2025 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 25 March 2025 53 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 March 2025 419 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 March 2025 419 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 February 2023 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 February 2023 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window