Governing document YORKSHIRE PHILHARMONIC CHOIR
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MARCH 1989 AS AMENDED 29 APRIL1997, 24 FEBRUARY 1998, 20 OCTOBER 1998, 5 JANUARY 1999, 2 NOVEMBER 1999 AND 17 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN APPRECIATION OF THE ART & SCIENCE OF CHORAL & INSTRUMENTAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAT FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.