Accounts and annual returns SAKYA LING TIBETAN BUDDHIST CENTRE

Charity number: 1079247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 September 2024 236 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 March 2022 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 October 2021 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required