Financial history SAKYA LING TIBETAN BUDDHIST CENTRE

Charity number: 1079247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.19k £684 £817 £1.55k £363
Total expenditure £1.16k £641 £613 £584 £655
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A